MT HB101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase reimbursement rates for children's medicaid mental health services
Title
Increase reimbursement rates for children's medicaid mental health services
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ehli [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2012-12-17 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2012-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2012-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-10-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-10-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-10-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-10-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-09-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-09-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-09-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-09-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |