MS SR24 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Congratulating Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., On The Occasion Of Its Policy Impact "2024 Aka Day At The Mississippi State Capitol" To Promote Advocacy And Take Action For Human Rights And Social Justice.
Title
Observe February 6, 2024, as "Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority Day at the Capitol."
Sponsors
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Andy Berry [R] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Rules |