MS SC702 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Suspending The Deadlines For The Purpose Of Requesting The Drafting, Introduction, Consideration And Passage Of A Bill Entitled "an Act Entitled The "federal Abortion-mandate Opt-out Act"; To Prohibit The Use Of Federal Funds To Pay For Elective Abortions Covered By Private Insurance In The State Of Mississippi Through A Health Care Exchange; And For Related Purposes."
Title
Suspend rules for drafting, etc.; prohibit use of federal funds to pay for elective abortions in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 83 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-23 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-04-22 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-22 | Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-20 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-20 | Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Referred To Rules |