MS SC701 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life Of Natchez Business And Civic Leader Sim Chase Callon And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature.
Title
Commend the life of Natchez business and civic leader Sim Chase Callon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Referred To Rules |