MS SC683 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Oak Grove "mojo" U12 Select Baseball Team And Their Coaches As The Current Baseball Players Association Mississippi State Champions.
Title
Commend the Oak Grove "Mojo" U12 Select Baseball Team as Mississippi State Champions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Tom King [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-20 | Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-26 | Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Referred To Rules |