MS SC679 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Saltillo "lady Tigers" Girls' Cross-country Team And Coach Charles Covington For Winning The 2015 Mhsaa 5a State Championship, Their 12th State Championship.
Title
Commend Saltillo Girls' Cross-Country Team and Coach Charles Covington for winning 2015 Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |