MS SC665 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Greetings Of The Mississippi Legislature To First Lady Michelle Obama On The Occasion Of Her Address At Jackson State University's 139th Spring Commencement Ceremony On April 23, 2016.
Title
Welcome First Lady Michelle Obama to Mississippi on the occasion of her address at JSU Spring Commencement Ceremony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-13 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-13 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |