MS SC662 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Legacy Of Leadership And Public Service Of Mayor Jimmy Clyde Of Magee, Mississippi.
Title
Recognize leadership and public service of Mayor Jimmy Clyde of Magee, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Caughman [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |