MS SC652 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Passing Of Mississippi Valley State University Civil Rights Pioneer John James, Jr., And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To His Bereaved Family.
Title
Mourn the passing of MVSU Civil Rights Pioneer John James, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] |
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-07 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Referred To Rules |