MS SC638 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The East Rankin Academy "lady Patriots" Basketball Team And Coach Michael Mcanally For Their First Mais Overall State Championship.
Title
Commend East Rankin Academy "Lady Patriots" Basketball Team for first Overall State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] |
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-11 | Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-03 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-03 | Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Referred To Rules |