MS SC635 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Madison-ridgeland Academy "patriots" Boys Basketball Team And Legendary Coach Richard Duease For An Unprecedented 4th Consecutive Mais Overall State Championship.
Title
Commend MRA "Patriots" Boys Basketball Team and Coach Richard Duease for unprecedented 4th consecutive MAIS State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-11 | Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-03 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-03 | Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Referred To Rules |