MS SC634 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting Respected Meridian Businessman, Mayor And World War Ii Veteran I. Alfred "al" Rosenbaum, Jr., On The Occasion Of His 90th Birthday.
Title
Recognize Meridian businessman, Mayor and WWII Veteran I. Alfred Rosenbaum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-11 | Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-09 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-09 | Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Referred To Rules |