MS SC632 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Simpson Academy Boys Basketball Coach James Crain On His Landmark 1,000th Win As A Head Coach.
Title
Congratulate Simpson Academy Basketball Coach James Crain on his landmark 1,000th win.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |