MS SC628 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing John Michael (mike) Allen For 35 Years Of Dedicated Professional Service To The Mississippi Crime Laboratory.
Title
Recognize John Michael (Mike) Allen for 35 years of dedicated service to the Mississippi Crime Laboratory.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |