MS SC624 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Simpson Academy "cougars" Boys Basketball Team And Coaches James And Carey Crain For Winning The 2019 Mais Aaaa Division Ii State Championship.
Title
Commend Simpson County Academy "Cougars" Boys Basketball Team for 2019 State 4A Division II Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Rules |