MS SC611 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting Lapetra Wilson, A Junior At Natchez High School, For Winning The Titles Of "mississippi Jr. Teen Cover Girl 2009-2010" And "national American Miss Cover Girl 2009-2010."
Title
Commend LaPetra Wilson, Miss Mississippi Jr. Teen Cover Girl and National American Miss Cover Girl 2009-2010.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-23 | Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-16 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-16 | Adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Rules |