MS SC604 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Legacy Of United States Army Korean War Casualty Pfc Jimmy Rowland Of Baldwyn, Mississippi, Who Was Identified Among The Unknown Buried Soldiers In The National Memorial Cemetery Of The Pacific (punchbowl) In Honolulu, Hawaii, And Extending The Deepest Sympathy And Respect Of The Legislature To His Surviving Family.
Title
Paying tribute to United States Army Korean War casualty PFC Jimmy Rowland of Baldwyn, Mississippi, finally laid to rest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-04-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |