MS SC604 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Oxford High School "lady Chargers" Girls Soccer Team And Coach Hunter Crane For Completing An Unbeaten Season By Winning A Repeat Mhsaa Class 5a State Championship On The Same Day The Oxford Boys Soccer Team Won Their State Championship.
Title
Commend Oxford High School "Lady Chargers" Girls Soccer Team for winning repeat Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |