MS SC597 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Booneville High School "blue Devils" Boys Basketball Team And Head Coach Michael Smith For Winning The 2022 Mhsaa Class 3a Boys State Basketball Championship.
Title
Commend Booneville High School "Blue Devils" Boys Basketball Team for winning 2022 Class 3A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |