MS SC585 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Joining Professional Football In Congratulating Former Jackson State University And National Football League Star Linebacker Robert Brazile Upon The Occasion Of His Induction Into The 2018 Class Of The Nfl Hall Of Fame.
Title
Congratulate JSU Star Linebacker Robert Brazile upon his induction into the NFL Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |