MS SC579 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Celebrating The 38th Anniversary Of The Delta Blues Museum In Clarksdale, Mississippi, And Extending The Best Wishes Of The Legislature.
Title
Celebrate 38th Anniversary of Delta Blues Museum in Clarksdale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |