MS SC574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Neshoba Central High School "lady Rockets" Slow Pitch Softball Team And Head Coach Trae Embry For Winning Their Seventh Consecutive 2018 Mhsaa Class 3a State Championship.
Title
Commend Neshoba Central Slow-Pitch Softball Team for 7th consecutive State Title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |