MS SC561 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating March 2023 As "american Red Cross Month In Mississippi" In Support Of Its Critical Humanitarian Mission.
Title
Designate March 2023 as "American Red Cross Month in Mississippi."
Sponsors
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Rod Hickman [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Tyler McCaughn [R] | Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] | Sen. Mike Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Rules |