MS SC559 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Outstanding Public Service Of Former United States Marshal Nehemiah Flowers, Jr., On The Occasion Of His Retirement From The State Parole Board.
Title
Recognize outstanding public service of former U.S. Marshal and State Parole Board Member Nehemiah Flowers, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] |
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |