MS SC559 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Miriam Sanderson Garner Of Houston, Mississippi, As The Governor-elect Of The Mississippi District Of Pilot International Service Organization.
Title
Recognize Miriam Garner of Houston, Mississippi, as Governor-Elect of Mississippi District of Pilot International.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-06 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-06 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-06 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Rules |