MS SC559 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Deepest Sympathy Of The Mississippi Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Respected Greenville Educator And Civic Leader Dr. Arthur Bennett Peyton, Sr.
Title
Mourn the passing of Dr. Arthur Bennett Peyton, Sr., respected Greenville educator and civic leader.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-10 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Rules |