MS SC558 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Dr. Al Rankins Of Greenville, Mississippi, As The First African American To Serve As Commissioner Of Higher Education In Mississippi And Commending His Record Of Achievement And Leadership.
Title
Recognize Dr. Al Rankins of Greenville, Mississippi, as first African American to serve as Commissioner of IHL.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-05-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-05-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |