MS SC555 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Passing And Commending The Life And Civic Contributions Of Businessman Wirt Adams Yerger, Jr., Of Jackson, Mississippi, And Recognizing His Leadership In The Political History Of Our State.
Title
Mourn passing and commend civic leadership of businessman Wirt Adams Yerger, Jr., of Jackson, MS.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] |
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-01 | House | Adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |