MS SC551 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To The Surviving Family And Pay Tribute To The Memory Of Hattiesburg Police Patrolman Benjamin J. Deen.
Title
Mourn the loss of fallen Hattiesburg Police Patrolman Benjamin J. Deen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-02 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |