MS SC551 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2013 Ocean Springs High School "greyhounds" Girls Soccer Team And Head Coach Patrick Hayes For Winning Their First Mhsaa 6a State Championship.
Title
Commend Ocean Springs High School "Greyhounds" Girls Soccer Team for winning first 6A Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] |
Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |