MS SC546 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Celebrating The Consecration And Elevation Of Bishop Dr. Charles E. Bass Of The Family Worship Church In Greenville, Mississippi, And Extending The Best Wishes Of The Legislature.
Title
Celebrating the Consecration of Bishop-Elect Dr. Charles E. Bass of Family Worship Church in Greenville, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |