MS SC541 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Profound Sorrow Of The Legislature On The Passing Of Jackson Municipal Airport Authority Commissioner Dr. Rosie Johnson And Condolences To Her Family.
Title
Extend condolences of Legislature on passing of Jackson Municipal Airport Authority Commissioner Dr. Rosie Johnson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |