MS SC533 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Miss Black Mississippi 2016 Robin Y. Jackson From Jackson, Mississippi, Who Placed Second Runner-up At The 48th Annual National Miss Black America Pageant.
Title
Commend Miss Black Mississippi 2016 Robin Y. Jackson who placed at the National Miss Black America Pageant Second Runner-Up.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |