MS SC529 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Germantown High School Band And Band Director Justin Harvison For Winning The Mhsaa/mba 2013 Class 5a State Marching Band Championship With The Highest Score In The History Of The Competition.
Title
Commend Germantown High School Marching Band for winning the 2013 Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. William Longwitz [R] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Russell Jolly [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-01-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-01-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-01-27 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Rules |