MS SC524 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating February 12, 2020, As The "world Cholangiocarcinoma Day" In The State Of Mississippi To Bring Awareness To Cholangiocarcinoma Or Bile Duct Cancer.
Title
Designate February 12, 2020, as "World Cholangiocarcinoma Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Rules |