MS SC524 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Recognition Of The Mississippi Legislature To Dr. David Marion For His Outstanding Record Of Professional Counseling Service And As The First Mississippian Elected To The National Seat Of Grand Basileus Of Omega Psi Phi Fraternity, Inc., In July 2018, And To Marion Counseling Services As A Leading Privately Owned Mental Health Counseling Provider In The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Recognize Dr. David Marion as the first Mississippian elected to national honorary for Professional Counseling Services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Rules |