MS SC517 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating Mississippi's Award-winning Country Music Star Faith Hill Upon The Unveiling Of The "mississippi Country Music Trail" Marker In Her Honor On December 19, 2015.
Title
Congratulate Faith Hill for Mississippi Country Music Trail Marker in her honor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-01-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |