MS SC516 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing March 2022 As "kidney Disease Awareness Month" And March 10, 2022, As "world Kidney Day" In Mississippi.
Title
Recognize March 2022 as "Kidney Disease Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |