MS SB3183 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 71-5-351, 71-5-353, 71-5-355, 71-5-357 And 71-5-359, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Certain Employers To Participate In The Mississippi Level Payment Plan (mlpp) Which Will Spread The Payment Of Employment Taxes Under The Mississippi Employment Security Law Throughout The Year; To Provide The Criteria That Employers Must Meet In Order To Participate In Mlpp; To Provide The Mlpp Payment Schedule; To Revise The Amount Of Wages That Is Considered Taxable Under Certain Provisions Of The Mississippi Employment Security Law; To Lower The Unemployment Tax Rate For Newly Subject Employers; To Revise The Amount Of The Workforce Enhancement Training Contribution; To Revise The Function Of The Size Of Fund Index To Set The Index Based Upon The Insured Unemployment Rate; To Lower The Minimum Tax Rate; To Revise The Percentage Of Taxable Wages That Political Subdivisions May Elect To Pay To The Employment Security Trust Fund In Lieu Of Contributions; To Revise The Amount Of The Bond That A Nonprofit Organization Post If It Elects To Become Liable For Payments In Lieu Of Contributions; To Revise The Manner In Which Payments Are Made By The State To The Unemployment Compensation Fund; To Provide That If A Political Subdivision Is Delinquent In Payments Due Under The Mississippi Employment Compensation Law Payments Due The Political Subdivision From Any State Agency May Be Intercepted To Satisfy The Delinquency; To Amend Section 27-104-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 71-5-503, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The July 1, 2010, Repeal Date On The Provision Of Law That Establishes The Weekly Benefit Amounts Under The Mississippi Employment Security; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Employment Security; revise unemployment for rates to make payment of the tax more equitable.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Brown [R] | Sen. Carl Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Died In Committee | |
2010-03-01 | Referred To Labor;Ways and Means | |
2010-02-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-24 | Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | Referred To Finance |