MS SB3162 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation To The Mississippi Fair Commission For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Dixie National Livestock Show; A Roundup For Junior Exhibitors Of Livestock And Goats; Supplemental Funds For Livestock Premiums; County Livestock Shows In Offering And Paying Prizes Or Awards To Competitors In Approved County Livestock Shows; The Five District Livestock Shows; The Five State Dairy Shows; The Mississippi High School Rodeo; And To Provide How Said Money Shall Be Paid Out Of The State Treasury For Fiscal Year 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Fair Comm. - Co. Livestock Show.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-24 Approved by Governor
2010-05-05 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-05-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-21 Conference Report Adopted
2010-04-21 Conference Report Adopted
2010-04-20 Conference Report Filed
2010-04-20 Conference Report Filed
2010-03-25 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121
2010-03-19 Conferees Named Stringer,Ward,Eaton
2010-03-17 Conferees Named Nunnelee,Moffatt,Lee (35th)
2010-03-17 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2010-03-12 Returned For Concurrence
2010-03-10 Passed As Amended
2010-03-10 Amended
2010-03-09 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-02-25 Referred To Appropriations
2010-02-24 Transmitted To House
2010-02-23 Passed
2010-02-16 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-02-15 Referred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback