MS SB3123 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 855, Local And Private Laws Of 1978, As Last Amended By Chapter 946, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, To Grant The City Of Hattiesburg, Forrest County And The Forrest County Industrial Park Commission Additional Powers Relating To The Funding Of Certain Projects In The Industrial Park; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forrest County & City of Hattiesburg; expand areas in which may acquire property for industrial purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-27 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-27 | Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2011-03-23 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-23 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-23 | Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-18 | Referred To Local and Private |