MS SB3090 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 816, Local And Private Laws Of 1991, As Last Amended By Chapter 932, Local And Private Laws Of 2017, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2021, To July 1, 2025, On The Provision Of Law That Establishes The Washington County Convention And Visitors Committee And Authorizes A Tax On Hotels, Motels And Restaurants; To Revise The Composition Of The Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Washington County; extend the repeal date on the Washington County Convention and Visitors Committee and the tourism tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Barton,Hines,Jackson |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named McMahan,Tate,Whaley |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-28 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-27 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-27 | House | Amended |
2021-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |