MS SB3088 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-5-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Computation Of Second Or Subsequent Offense Of Depicting Child Sexual Conduct; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child sexual conduct; revise computation of second or subsequent offense of depiction of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |