MS SB3071 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Chapter 916, Local And Private Laws Of 2008, As Last Amended By Chapter 906, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Board Of Supervisors Of Monroe County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds Annually To The Monroe County Chamber Of Commerce; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Monroe County; extend the repeal date on law authorizing contributions to the Monroe County Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Ladner, Barton, Jackson) |
2018-03-24 | House | Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |