MS SB3060 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From The Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund To The State Department Of Health For The Purpose Of Administering The Covid-19 Hospital Expanded Capacity Program; To Make An Appropriation From The Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund To The State Department Of Health For The Purpose Of Administering The Covid-19 Mississippi Local Provider Innovation Grant Program.
Title
Appropriation; additional to Health Department for the Covid-19 Hospital Capacity Program and operations-ARPA funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] | Sen. Bart Williams [R] |
Sen. David Blount [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Butler (36th) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | House | Amended |
2022-03-10 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |