MS SB3037 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The State Department Of Agriculture And Commerce For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Dixie National Livestock Show; A Roundup For Junior Exhibitors Of Livestock And Goats; Supplemental Funds For Livestock Premiums; County Livestock Shows In Offering And Paying Prizes Or Awards To Competitors In Approved County Livestock Shows; The Five District Livestock Shows; The Five State Dairy Shows; The Mississippi High School Rodeo; And To Provide How Said Money Shall Be Paid Out Of The State Treasury For Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Fair and Coliseum Commission - Livestock shows.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] |
Sen. Tyler McCaughn [R] | Sen. Michael McLendon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-05-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 64 | |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Bounds,Read,Pigott |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,DeLano,McCaughn |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To A1 |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: A1 To AP |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations B;Appropriations A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |