MS SB3020 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To Defray The Expenses Of The Department Of Public Safety For Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Public Safety, Department of.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Rod Hickman [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Deweese,Read,Cockerham |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Norwood |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To A2 |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: A2 To AP |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations C;Appropriations A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |