MS SB3018 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The State Veterans Affairs Board And The Mississippi State Veterans Homes For Fiscal Year 2024.
Title
Appropriation; Veterans Affairs Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] |
Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-26 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | House | Conferees Named Read,Barton,Oliver |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,DeLano,Seymour |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-09 | House | Amended |
2023-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |