MS SB3005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Conferees Named Read,Beckett,Bounds
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For Support Of The Eight Universities For Fiscal Year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; IHL - General support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Read,Beckett,Bounds
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Wilemon
2019-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-22HouseReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-20SenatePassed
2019-02-19SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-18SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback