MS SB2992 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Health Benefit Exchange Act"; To Define Certain Terms Used In The Act; To Establish The Exchange As A Not-for-profit Corporation With A Legal Existence Separate From That Of The State Of Mississippi; To Establish A Board Of Directors Of The Exchange And To Provide For Its Membership; To Authorize The Board To Perform Certain Acts; To Require The Board To Appoint An Executive Director Of The Exchange; To Prescribe The Duties Of The Exchange; To Require The Exchange To Make Qualified Health Plans Available To Qualified Individuals And Qualified Employers Beginning With Effective Dates On Or Before January 1, 2014; To Authorize The Exchange To Charge Assessments Or User Fees To Health Carriers; To Authorize The Department Of Insurance To Promulgate Regulations To Implement And Enforce The Provisions Of The Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Health Benefit Exchange Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Died On Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Insurance | |
2011-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-09 | Passed | |
2011-02-09 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-26 | DR - TSDPCS: PH To IN | |
2011-01-20 | DR - TSDPCS: IN To PH | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Insurance;Public Health and Welfare |